Wednesday, February 20, 2019

Maths Trick Chapter 1

Lesson1 Lesson1 These slightons argon based on Vedic Maths principles and other maths tricks. These principles are general in personality and can be applied in many ways and genuinely very useful in commercial arthematics. I hope only of you like these lessons and make your calculation more fast and save plow of succession in daily calculations and examinations or any entrance audition like CAT /IIT /BANK PO /ENGINEERING ENTRANCE try out/PMT /MCA ENTRANCE TEST/MBA ENTRANCE TEST etc etc Method for com stickeing numbers where the early figures are same and the hold waterly figures agree to1 0 . 42 x 48 = Both numbers here start with 4 and the last igures (2 and 8) add up to 10. just multiply 4 by 5 (the next number up) to get 20 for the origin part of the wait on. And we multiply the last figures 2 x 8 = 16 to get the last part of the answer Method for multiplying numbers where the first figures add up 10 and the last figures are same 44X64 here(predicate) first figures are 4 and 6 and their add up 10 and unit figures of two number are same Just multiplying the last figures 44=16 Put it at well(p) open side again multiplying the first figures and add common degit(46 )+4=24+4=28 put it at left business deal side directly we get required answer2816Similarly 3676 , 6X6 =36 right hand side , (37)+6= 21+6=27 left hand side Required answer is 2736 NOTE If multiplication of last figures is less than 10 add zero in front unit digit Ex 8121 , 11=01,( 82)+1= 16+1=17 Required answer 1701 Method for multiplying numbers where the first numbers add up10 and and the second numbers digits are same 46X55 Here first numbers add up is 10 and second number s digits are common i. e 5 Just multiplying last figures of both(prenominal) numbers 65 =30 put it at right hand side Again multiplying first figures of both numbers and add common digit of second number (45)+5 =20+5 =25 put it left hand sideRequired answer is 2530 ( If multiplication is in unit in first st ep add zero before it) load///D/Documents%20and%20Settings/sanjay/Desktop/maths%20tricks/lesson1ur20. htm (1 of 3)6/25/2003 40019 PM Lesson1 Multiplying numbers just over 100. 108 x 109 = 11772 The answer is in two parts 117 and 72, 117 is just 108 + 9 (or 109 + 8), and 72 is just 8 x 9. Similarly 107 x 106 = 11342 HOW USEFUL IS THIS CALCULATION EXAMPLE 1 Compute the amount and the compound intrest on Rs 10000. 00 on 2. years at4%per annum. at a time 44=16 and 4+4=8 put 10 it becomes Rs 10816. 00 How simple o calculation no extra time Practice Test 1 Solve mentally these questions Note vanquish your calculation time by watch (Suggested time 90 seconds) 22 X 28 35 X 35 48 X 42 73 X 33 12 X 92 48 X 28 28 X 22 37 X 88 91 X 66 118 X105 109 X108 112 X106 91 X 99 33 X 37 55X55 Now check your answer with the help of a calculator Back Home Next file///D/Documents%20and%20Settings/sanjay/Desktop/maths%20tricks/lesson1ur20. htm (2 of 3)6/25/2003 40019 PM Lesson1 file///D/Documents%20and% 20Settings/sanjay/Desktop/maths%20tricks/lesson1ur20. htm (3 of 3)6/25/2003 40019 PM

No comments:

Post a Comment